09/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
08/22/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/22/2011 | In Senate. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2006.) | |||
08/22/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2479.) | |||
08/15/2011 | Read and amended. (Page 2387.) | |||
07/14/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). | |||
07/13/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
07/12/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
06/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/09/2011 | From printer. | |||
06/08/2011 | Introduced. To print. |