09/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
08/23/2011 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | |||
08/18/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/18/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1976.) | |||
07/11/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/11/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2267.) | |||
07/06/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |||
06/23/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/22/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended. | |||
06/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/10/2011 | From printer. | |||
06/09/2011 | Introduced. To print. |