BILL NUMBER: ACR 7CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 26 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 6, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JUNE 6, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 28, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Williams JANUARY 19, 2011 Relative to the 23rd Annual State Scientist Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 7, Williams. 23rd Annual State Scientist Day. This measure would declare May 18, 2011, as the 23rd Annual State Scientist Day, as a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California. WHEREAS, The state employs nearly 3,000 professional scientists in over 30 state departments working in more than 230 scientific classifications; and WHEREAS, State scientists hold graduate degrees in virtually every scientific discipline, including nematology, virology, seismology, epidemiology, toxicology, and many others; and WHEREAS, State scientists are represented by the California Association of Professional Scientists (CAPS), which is dedicated to professionalism, independence, and responsible advocacy; and WHEREAS, The work of state scientists protects the public from life-threatening diseases, safeguards our wildlife and abundant natural resources, and protects our air and water from toxic waste and pollution; and WHEREAS, State scientists are required to make critical decisions every day based on rigorous scientific factfinding and these decisions ultimately impact the lives and property of all Californians; and WHEREAS, State scientists perform important work in the areas of infectious disease prevention, oil spill prevention and cleanup, public health drinking water monitoring, the protection of agricultural crops, brownfields mitigation, chemical and radiological disaster response, and much more; and WHEREAS, State scientists host an annual State Scientist Day at the State Capitol to increase public awareness and recognition of the significant contributions made by scientists working in state government while entertaining and educating over 2,000 elementary school students with fun, hands-on science exhibits, including digging for hidden artifacts, viewing live fish in a 1,500-gallon tank, and playing Pollution Prevention "Wheel of Fortune" and Coastal Creature "Jeopardy"; and WHEREAS, State Scientist Day has sparked an interest in science for thousands of California school children, legislators, state employees, and the public who attend the special event; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That May 18, 2011, shall be recognized as the 23rd Annual State Scientist Day, and that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.