California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR71 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/28/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 71CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 110 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 28, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fletcher JUNE 27, 2011 Relative to Plasma Protein Therapies Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 71, Fletcher. Plasma Protein Therapies Month. This measure would recognize September 2011 as Plasma Protein Therapies Month and encourage the people of California to observe this month with appropriate programs and activities. WHEREAS, Patients with rare, chronic, genetic diseases and disorders across the United States rely upon access to plasma-driven and recombinant analog therapies, known collectively as "plasma protein therapies," to treat life-threatening conditions; and WHEREAS, These diseases and disorders, including, but not limited to, hemophilia, von Willebrand disease, primary immunodeficiency diseases, Chronic Inflammatory Demyelinating Polyneuropathy, Kawasaki disease, and alpha-1 antitrypsin deficiency, are most effectively treated with plasma protein therapies; and WHEREAS, Individuals afflicted with these rare disorders require access to the full range of plasma protein therapies to help ensure the best possible clinical outcomes; and WHEREAS, These individuals benefit from access to the appropriate providers of these therapies; and WHEREAS, These individuals need pharmacy options and the delivery of home-supported services; and WHEREAS, Access to comprehensive care has been shown to markedly improve patient outcomes; and WHEREAS, There are 10 plasma collection centers in the State of California certified under the International Quality Plasma Program where healthy, committed donors provide plasma used to manufacture high-impact, life-saving therapies; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of September 2011, as Plasma Protein Therapies Month, and encourages the people of California to observe this month with appropriate programs and activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.