California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR72 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/28/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 72CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 111 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 28, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Alejo (Coauthors: Assembly Members Allen, Ammiano, Block, Butler, Campos, Carter, Davis, Eng, Hall, Roger Hernndez, Hueso, Huffman, Lara, Bonnie Lowenthal, Mendoza, Pan, Perea, V. Manuel Prez, Portantino, Solorio, Williams, Yamada, Achadjian, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Blumenfield, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Cedillo, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Dickinson, Donnelly, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Furutani, Beth Gaines, Garrick, Gordon, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Harkey, Hayashi, Hill, Huber, Jeffries, Logue, Ma, Mansoor, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Norby, Olsen, Silva, Skinner, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, and Wieckowski) (Coauthors: Senators Berryhill, Kehoe, Pavley, Rubio, Wright, and Yee) JUNE 29, 2011 Relative to Native American Heritage Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 72, Alejo. Native American Heritage Month. This measure would recognize the month of November 2011 as Native American Heritage Month, would encourage Californians to participate in appropriate observances that celebrate and commemorate Native Americans, and would applaud and encourage the observance of California Indian nations for their outstanding contributions to this state. WHEREAS, California Native American heritage and the Native American community contribute immeasurably to our state's history, and continue to enrich the diversity of our culture by distinguishing themselves as academics, entrepreneurs, and leaders in all aspects of our society; and WHEREAS, Prior to the European colonization of the Americas, the indigenous people of California thrived with a vibrant culture and society; and WHEREAS, California Native American heritage predates our 19th-century statehood, and the experiences of California Native Americans have been marked by moments of triumph and hardship; and WHEREAS, California Native Americans have withstood the pressures to lose their rich cultural knowledge of languages, beliefs, and traditions that have been passed on from generation to generation; and WHEREAS, California Native American heritage is richly interwoven with California's diverse cultural and social fabric; and WHEREAS, Through their rich cultural traditions and proud ancestry, California Native Americans have made vital contributions to the strength and diversity of our society in such areas as law, medicine, business, education, and the United States Armed Forces; and WHEREAS, California Native Americans have proudly served in the United States Armed Forces for over 200 years, defending the security of our state and nation with their lives, including engaging in World War II and Operation Iraqi Freedom, with honor, determination, and distinction; and WHEREAS, The work of Native American leaders has sought to bridge racial, socioeconomic, and environmental barriers by empowering and educating people in order to protect Native American culture and heritage for future generations; and WHEREAS, The California Native American heritage experience has been studied and taught by academic scholars throughout the state, and its relevance and importance is exemplified by the creation of Native American studies departments in our state's university system; and WHEREAS, The Native American studies program exists to broaden the understanding of students interested in the history, culture, literature, and contemporary issues of California Native American heritage; and WHEREAS, Baccalaureate degrees in Native American studies are now offered at six University of California campuses and 10 California State University campuses; and WHEREAS, California Native Americans have faced numerous barriers to business development, but have overcome those barriers to persevere and contribute to Native American communities throughout the state and country, and exemplify Native American entrepreneurship in such areas as economic development, the food service industry, health care, and banking finance; and WHEREAS, As we celebrate the contributions of California Native American heritage, let it not be lost on us the tremendous sacrifice, self-determination, and great continued inspiration to our state of California Native Americans; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of November 2011, as Native American Heritage Month, and encourages all Californians to participate in appropriate observances with activities that celebrate and commemorate Native Americans as a symbol of hope and courage to all citizens; and be it further Resolved, That this recognition applauds and encourages the observance of California Indian nations for their outstanding contributions to this great state; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.