|
04/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3164.)
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4179.)
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 1).
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Amended.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|