09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/07/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2347.) | |||
08/31/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/23/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/22/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2502.) | |||
08/18/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 18). | |||
08/17/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/16/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
07/05/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
07/01/2011 | From printer. | |||
06/30/2011 | Introduced. To print. |