09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/08/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2428.) | |||
09/07/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/06/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2929.) | |||
09/02/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (September 2). | |||
09/01/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/29/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
08/26/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | |||
07/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
07/12/2011 | From printer. | |||
07/11/2011 | Introduced. To print. |