02/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2011. | |||
02/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:20 p.m. | |||
02/24/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
02/24/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 262.) | |||
02/07/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/03/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 266.) | |||
02/01/2011 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/27/2011 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 27). | |||
01/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/21/2011 | From printer. | |||
01/20/2011 | Introduced. To print. |