09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/08/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2427.) | |||
08/25/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/25/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2594.) | |||
08/22/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 22). | |||
08/18/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/16/2011 | From printer. | |||
08/15/2011 | Introduced. To print. |