09/22/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/22/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/08/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2427.) | |||
09/06/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/02/2011 | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 2805.) Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2868.) | |||
09/01/2011 | Read and amended. (Page 2769.) | |||
08/29/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |||
08/24/2011 | From printer. | |||
08/23/2011 | Introduced. To print. |