06/07/2012 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett. | |||
05/23/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/06/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/02/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3681.) | |||
01/25/2012 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/24/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (January 23). | |||
01/17/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/13/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
01/05/2012 | From printer. | |||
01/04/2012 | Introduced. To print. |