05/17/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/17/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | |||
05/14/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/14/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 3492.) | |||
03/22/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/31/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/30/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3628.) | |||
01/26/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (January 26). | |||
01/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/05/2012 | From printer. | |||
01/04/2012 | Introduced. To print. |