06/01/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/01/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/29/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3659.) | |||
05/16/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/24/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/23/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3555.) | |||
01/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 19). | |||
01/13/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/12/2012 | From printer. | |||
01/11/2012 | Introduced. To print. |