03/07/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2012. | |||
03/07/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:15 p.m. | |||
03/01/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
03/01/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2897.) | |||
02/06/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/02/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3678.) | |||
01/31/2012 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/30/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 26). | |||
01/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/19/2012 | From printer. | |||
01/18/2012 | Introduced. To print. |