LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR92
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR92
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR92
Action History
02/07/2012
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
02/06/2012
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3691.)
02/02/2012
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (February 2).
01/26/2012
Referred to Com. on RLS.
01/20/2012
From printer.
01/19/2012
Introduced. To print.