06/07/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/07/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/04/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3767.) | |||
05/23/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/07/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/06/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3692.) | |||
02/02/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 2). | |||
01/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/24/2012 | From printer. | |||
01/23/2012 | Introduced. To print. |