LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR95
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR95
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR95
Action History
05/24/2012
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/24/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
03/22/2012
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
01/31/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. (pursuant to Joint Rules 4 and 6 this resolution will be treated as a bill.)
01/30/2012
Read first time. To print.