06/25/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/25/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | |||
06/15/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/15/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3940.) | |||
05/21/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/17/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4878.) | |||
05/03/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/03/2012 | From printer. | |||
02/02/2012 | Introduced. To print. |