08/29/2011 | Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 2629.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Donnelly. Reconsideration granted. (Page 2629.) Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2653.) | |||
08/25/2011 | Amended. (Page 2570.) | |||
07/14/2011 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/13/2011 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 13). | |||
04/06/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/15/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | |||
01/20/2011 | From printer. | |||
01/19/2011 | Introduced. To print. |