07/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
07/14/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/14/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1849.) | |||
06/22/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |||
06/15/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/02/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/03/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/02/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 1166.) | |||
04/15/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 13). | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/31/2011 | From printer. | |||
03/30/2011 | Introduced. To print. |