07/18/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/18/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
07/11/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/11/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1781.) | |||
07/07/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/29/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/28/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2101.) | |||
06/23/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |||
05/23/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/17/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/16/2011 | Introduced. To print. |