07/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
07/14/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/14/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1858.) | |||
07/07/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/27/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/27/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2075.) | |||
06/22/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 21). | |||
06/13/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/18/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/17/2011 | Introduced. To print. |