09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/08/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 8). Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2421.) | |||
09/07/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Page 2331.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2332.) | |||
09/01/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/31/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 2730.) | |||
08/30/2011 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/29/2011 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 23). | |||
08/18/2011 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |||
08/16/2011 | From printer. | |||
08/15/2011 | Introduced. To print. |