09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/08/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/08/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2392.) | |||
09/07/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/31/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/31/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 9. Page 2730.) | |||
08/29/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 29). | |||
08/17/2011 | From printer. | |||
08/16/2011 | Introduced. To print. |