09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/10/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/10/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2485.) | |||
09/09/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/08/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3104.) | |||
09/06/2011 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 6). | |||
09/01/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
08/31/2011 | From printer. | |||
08/30/2011 | Introduced. To print. |