09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/10/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/10/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2488.) | |||
09/09/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
09/08/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/07/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3014.) | |||
09/06/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 6). | |||
09/02/2011 | From printer. | |||
09/01/2011 | Introduced. To print. |