09/18/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/18/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | |||
08/29/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/29/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4944.) | |||
08/27/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/22/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/22/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6133.) | |||
08/21/2012 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/20/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |||
08/15/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
08/14/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Amended. | |||
08/13/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
09/09/2011 | From printer. | |||
09/08/2011 | Introduced. To print. |