LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR2
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR2
Action History
04/07/2011
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
04/04/2011
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4).
03/22/2011
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
03/21/2011
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
03/17/2011
Referred to Com. on RLS.
01/26/2011
From printer.
01/25/2011
Introduced. To print.