07/12/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/12/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:20 a.m. | |||
07/05/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/05/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4285.) | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 12). | |||
05/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (May 8). | |||
04/30/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. | |||
03/22/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 4102.) | |||
03/20/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 20). | |||
03/14/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
01/06/2012 | From printer. | |||
01/05/2012 | Introduced. To print. |