08/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
08/06/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/06/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 4375.) | |||
06/04/2012 | Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 20. Noes 11. Page 3768.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Lieu. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3768.) | |||
05/16/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/26/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/26/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 4129.) | |||
03/20/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (March 19). | |||
03/15/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/14/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
01/25/2012 | From printer. | |||
01/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |