LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR27
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR27
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR27
Compare Versions
AJR27 Chaptered August 10, 2012
AJR27 Enrolled August 8, 2012
AJR27 Amended May 14, 2012
AJR27 Amended May 8, 2012
AJR27 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AJR27 Chaptered August 10, 2012
AJR27 Enrolled August 8, 2012
AJR27 Amended May 14, 2012
AJR27 Amended May 8, 2012
AJR27 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare