09/06/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/06/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | |||
08/22/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/21/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4637.) | |||
08/16/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/03/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/02/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5556.) | |||
06/28/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/23/2012 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cook. | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. To print. |