08/28/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/28/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 6434.) | |||
08/24/2012 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/22/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22). | |||
08/07/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
08/06/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
06/06/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |