09/18/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/18/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | |||
08/29/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/29/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4952.) | |||
06/06/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 6). | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/10/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/09/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 4245.) | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (March 27). | |||
03/08/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/07/2012 | Introduced. To print. |