03/29/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2012. | |||
03/29/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
03/26/2012 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4128.). | |||
03/22/2012 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
03/22/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 0. Page 2986.) | |||
03/20/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2012 | Measure version as amended on March 15 corrected. | |||
03/15/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3993.) Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3994.) | |||
03/12/2012 | Introduced. To print. From printer. Referred to Com. on RLS. |