|
06/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1976.).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2011
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1383.)
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1039.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|