06/27/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/27/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:05 p.m. | |||
06/23/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/23/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1536.) | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/19/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.) | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/15/2011 | From printer. | |||
03/14/2011 | Introduced. To print. |