LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR24
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR24
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR24
Action History
03/22/2012
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4080.).
03/15/2012
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15).
03/14/2012
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
03/13/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
03/05/2012
Referred to Com. on RLS.
02/23/2012
Introduced.