LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR34
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR34
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR34
Action History
08/30/2012
Read. Adopted. (Page 6611.).
08/22/2012
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
08/21/2012
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 15).
08/07/2012
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
08/06/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended.
07/05/2012
Referred to Com. on ED.
07/02/2012
Introduced.