LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR37
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR37
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR37
Action History
08/31/2012
Amended. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read. Adopted. (Page 6763.).
08/30/2012
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 29).
08/28/2012
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6468.)
08/27/2012
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
08/24/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended.
08/09/2012
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
08/07/2012
Introduced.