LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR4
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR4
Action History
03/17/2011
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 614.).
03/10/2011
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10).
03/09/2011
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
03/08/2011
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
02/10/2011
Referred to Com. on RLS.
01/27/2011
Introduced.