California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR4 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/08/2011

 BILL NUMBER: HR 4AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 8, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 18, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Galgiani and Valadao (Coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Bill Berryhill, Hill, Ma, Mendoza, Olsen, Perea, and Yamada) JANUARY 27, 2011 Relative to California Agriculture Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, March 23, 2011, is designated as California Agriculture Day, a day of celebration to commemorate agriculture's vital role in keeping Californians nourished and the state's economy ranked as the eighth largest in the world; and WHEREAS, The 2011 theme of California Agriculture Day is "Agriculture Drives California" to recognize the contribution agriculture makes to the California economy; and WHEREAS, California's agricultural community provides a vital infrastructure that aids in the exclusion and early detection of plant and animal pests and diseases that impact public health, the environment, and commerce; and WHEREAS, For approximately 62 consecutive years, California has been the number one agricultural state in the nation, producing more than 350 crop and livestock products and accounting for approximately 50 percent of the nation's supply of fruits, vegetables, and nuts; and WHEREAS, The inexhaustible efforts of approximately 850,000 farmworkers have contributed greatly to the success of the industry; and WHEREAS, With less than 1 percent of California's population engaged in farming and agriculture, each agricultural worker today provides for more than 100 other people, compared to just 13 in 1947; and WHEREAS, Today's agricultural industry offers over  200   300  challenging and rewarding career opportunities, from on-farm cultivation, to food science and engineering; and WHEREAS, Over the past five decades, advances in production agriculture have resulted in a drop in consumer spending on food products from  24   21  percent of disposable income in 1949 to approximately 9 percent today; and WHEREAS, California is the nation's leader in agricultural exports, shipping more than 12 billion dollars worth of food and agricultural commodities to continents ranging from Europe to Asia, and from Africa to South America; and WHEREAS, California's agricultural industry constantly seeks to incorporate the latest scientific and technological production and marketing techniques to meet the demands of changing consumer needs and complex world markets; and WHEREAS, Government-industry partnerships are continually being developed to improve quality and ensure safe handling practices on the farm, in transit, and during processing; and WHEREAS, "California Grown" is a public-private partnership campaign that emphasizes our strong ties to the land and our neighbors, and our desire to restore pride in our homegrown products and our quality of work; and WHEREAS, A broad approach to agricultural education is vital to ensure that California agriculture continues to flourish; and WHEREAS, The California "5 A Day--For Better Health" campaign, launched in 1988, was the precursor for the national "5 A Day" program, which spreads the message that healthy eating through the consumption of fruits and vegetables can reduce the risk of heart disease and cancer by as much as 30 percent; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate for all Californians to recognize our farmers, farmworkers, and others involved in providing such a bounty to our nation and the entire world; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That it takes great pleasure in honoring the men and women of California agriculture for their dedication and productivity by observing the week of March 13 to March 19, 2011, inclusive, as National Agriculture Week, and Wednesday, March 23, 2011, as California Agriculture Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.