LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
HB124
Compare Versions
CA
California House Bill HB124
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California House Bill HB124
Compare Versions
HB124 Chaptered October 8, 2011
HB124 Enrolled September 9, 2011
HB124 Amended July 14, 2011
HB124 Amended June 29, 2011
HB124 Amended May 27, 2011
HB124 Amended April 6, 2011
HB124 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
HB124 Chaptered October 8, 2011
HB124 Enrolled September 9, 2011
HB124 Amended July 14, 2011
HB124 Amended June 29, 2011
HB124 Amended May 27, 2011
HB124 Amended April 6, 2011
HB124 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare