08/25/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Simitian. | |||
08/17/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/16/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15). | |||
06/28/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/05/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 1234.) | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
03/31/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/04/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |||
02/03/2011 | Read first time. To print. |