LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB100
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB100
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB100
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 11, 2011
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 1, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 9, 2011
Compare
Amended
Bill
July 12, 2011
Compare
Bill
June 23, 2011
Compare
Bill
May 3, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 25, 2011
Compare