LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1000
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1000
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1000
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 6, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 14, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 23, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 18, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 10, 2012
Compare