|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 732, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 6010.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5895.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3735.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3457.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|