|
07/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2052.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 655.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 540.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|