06/27/2012 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending. | |||
06/27/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/27/2012 | Approved by the Governor with item veto. | |||
06/27/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m. | |||
06/27/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 4146.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/27/2012 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 5460.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 5473.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/22/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
03/22/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2978.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/08/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2916.) Ordered to second reading. | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/07/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | |||
02/06/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |